+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Final disposition: Held awaiting House action on Senate amendments
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Driggs flr amend (ref Bill)
- Third read: Passed
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:23 pmobject
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Driggs flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Driggs flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 30, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
March 12, 2013: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 11, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
January 29, 2013: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
January 29, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2