+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 92
- Action: Signed
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:10 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Government Reform: Do pass
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Amendment passed: COM
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- House first read
+ − Amendments (4)
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 6, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
March 2, 2011: Government Reform: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
March 1, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 3
February 14, 2011: Commerce: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
February 14, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor