+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On May 16, 2007 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 216
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Final disposition: None
On May 10, 2007 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On May 9, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On May 1, 2007 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 30, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: GOV (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Flake flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: O'Halleran flr amend (ref Bill)
On April 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Government: Do pass amended
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: CMMA
- Amendment passed: WM
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass amended
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs: Do pass amended
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (15)
O'Halleran Floor Amendment, reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government
Senate Adopted Amendment
Flake Floor Amendment, reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs
House Adopted Amendment
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
Government
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government
Senate Proposed Amendment
O'Halleran Floor Amendment, reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government
Senate Adopted Amendment
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
Flake Floor Amendment, reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government
Senate Proposed Amendment
3-19 caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs
House Adopted Amendment
Government
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
May 10, 2007: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 5
April 30, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
March 7, 2007: Government: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 3
March 6, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
January 23, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
January 23, 2007: Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
January 23, 2007: Ways and Means: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 10