+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Petersen
- Final disposition: Substituted Senate bill on third reading
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 2:02 pmobject
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Petersen Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Petersen Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
January 28, 2014: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
January 28, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor