+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Smith
- Third read: Passed
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Insurance and Retirement: Do pass
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Insurance and Retirement
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (10)
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Smith Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Finance - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Smith Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Finance - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 13, 2014: Finance: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 12, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 4
January 28, 2014: Insurance and Retirement: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
January 28, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor