+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 16, 2007 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 81
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Final disposition: None
On April 10, 2007 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 5, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 3, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Landrum Taylor flr amend (ref Bill)
On March 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 12:15 pmobject
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: WA
- Amendment: Ableser flr am to bill - w/d
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On January 25, 2007 in the House:
- Water and Agriculture: Do pass amended
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Water and Agriculture
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (6)
Water and Agriculture
House Adopted Amendment
Landrum Taylor Floor Amendment, reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
4-3 as passed senate
Senate Fact Sheet
Water and Agriculture
House Adopted Amendment
Landrum Taylor Floor Amendment, reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-26 nrra
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 10, 2007: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
April 3, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
February 12, 2007: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
February 5, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 2
January 22, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 10
January 22, 2007: Water and Agriculture: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 10