+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 3
- Action: Signed
On March 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Motion to substitute hb 2486 for sb 1408. motion carried.
- Miscellaneous motion
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
- Rules: Withdrawn
- Judiciary: Withdrawn
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Senate second read
On February 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 21, 2008 in the House:
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Gallardo
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Pearce
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 10:30 amobject
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On January 30, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On January 29, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- House first read
+ − Amendments (2)
Pearce floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Pearce floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 13, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
February 26, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
January 29, 2008: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
January 29, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor