+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 10, 2009 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 108
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On July 1, 2009 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 23, 2009 in the House:
- HB 2486 substituted for SB 1404 on Third Reading.
On June 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On June 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Commerce and Economic Development: Withdrawn
- Rules: Withdrawn
On June 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Economic Development
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On June 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 9, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: BI
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- Banking and Insurance: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Banking and Insurance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Banking and Insurance - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Banking and Insurance - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
June 23, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
June 9, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
March 30, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
March 2, 2009: Banking and Insurance: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor