+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On June 20, 2007 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 254
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Final disposition: None
On June 18, 2007 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On May 9, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On May 1, 2007 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 26, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref Bill)
- COW motion
- Senator gould to show the bill failed to pass
On April 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Government: Do pass
On March 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: WM
- Amendment: CMMA - w/d
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs: Do pass amended
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (9)
Ways and Means - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Ways and Means - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs
House Adopted Amendment
Ways and Means - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Ways and Means - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-22 gov
Senate Fact Sheet
Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
June 18, 2007: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 11
April 26, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 2
March 19, 2007: Government: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
March 15, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
January 23, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
January 23, 2007: Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
January 23, 2007: Ways and Means: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor