+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred.
- Final reading in House: PASSED
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
- House Minority Caucus.
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- TAT (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass amended.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Amended by TRANS - passed as amended
- Floor Amend to TRANS - Carroll - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 1:55PM.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- House Transportation Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Transportation Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (6)
April 6, 2021: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 5
March 29, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
February 24, 2021: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 23, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 18
February 1, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 1, 2021: House Transportation Committee
- Yeas: 11