+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: ED
- Amendment withdrawn: Floor Amend to Bill - Carter
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Appropriations: Withdrawn
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Education: Do pass amended
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (11)
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education
House Adopted Amendment
Education - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education
House Proposed Amendment
Education
House Adopted Amendment
Education - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 10, 2014: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 9
March 10, 2014: Education: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
March 6, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 2
January 28, 2014: Education: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
January 28, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor