+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:08PM.
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Shope - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:11PM.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- House Ways and Means Committee: do pass.
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Ways and Means Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 14, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
February 28, 2018: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 21, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 13
January 30, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 30, 2018: House Ways and Means Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1