+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 7, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 3:58PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (10)
May 7, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
May 7, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
March 3, 2016: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 3, 2016: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
February 29, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
February 29, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
January 25, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
January 25, 2016: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 12
January 25, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
January 25, 2016: Appropriations: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor