+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Action: Signed
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Chapter: 62
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:15 pmobject
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Safety: Do pass
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 2:02 pm
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (5)
April 16, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 1
March 17, 2014: Public Safety: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
March 17, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 3
January 28, 2014: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
January 28, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor