+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred.
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Final reading in House: Passed
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Petersen flr amend (ref COMPS) adopted
- COMPS (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Livingston - passed
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 11:12AM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- House Banking and Insurance Committee: do pass.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Banking and Insurance Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
May 8, 2017: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 25
April 24, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
February 28, 2017: Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
February 22, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 6
February 8, 2017: House Banking and Insurance Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
February 8, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor