+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 176
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Transmitted to: Governor
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:25 pm
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce, Energy and Military
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: TI
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Technology and Infrastructure: Do pass amended
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Commerce: Withdrawn
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Technology and Infrastructure
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
Technology and Infrastructure
House Proposed Amendment
Technology and Infrastructure
House Adopted Amendment
Technology and Infrastructure
House Adopted Amendment
Technology and Infrastructure
House Proposed Amendment
3-11 cem
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
May 1, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
March 5, 2013: Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 28, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 4
January 24, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
January 24, 2013: Technology and Infrastructure: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor