+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 7, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Olson - passed
- WM - passed
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- House Ways and Means Committee: do pass amended.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Ways and Means Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (5)
Ways and Means
House Proposed Amendment
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Olson - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (12)
May 7, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 2
May 7, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 10
February 23, 2016: Education: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 23, 2016: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
February 23, 2016: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 23, 2016: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
February 18, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 23
February 18, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 3
January 25, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 25, 2016: Ways and Means: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
January 25, 2016: House Ways and Means Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
January 25, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor