+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 5:20PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- House Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Judiciary Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (5)
May 16, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 2
February 25, 2019: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 14, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 60
January 28, 2019: House Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 10
January 28, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor