+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 94
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:15 pmobject
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Government and Environment: Do pass
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government and Environment
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: GOV
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to GOV - Petersen
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Government: Do pass amended
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (8)
Petersen Floor Amendment; Reference to GOVERNMENT Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Government
House Proposed Amendment
Government
House Adopted Amendment
Government
House Proposed Amendment
Petersen Floor Amendment; Reference to GOVERNMENT Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Government
House Adopted Amendment
3-17 ge_revised
Senate Fact Sheet
3-14 ge
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 15, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 6
March 10, 2014: Government and Environment: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 4, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Present/NV: 5
January 28, 2014: Government: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 28, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor