+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred.
- Final reading in House: Passed
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
- House Minority Caucus.
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Burges flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:09PM.
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- JPS - passed
- Floor Amend to Bill - Farnsworth #1 - passed
- Floor Amend to Bill - Farnsworth #2 - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee: do pass amended.
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee: do pass.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (7)
April 10, 2017: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 1
April 3, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
February 28, 2017: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 23, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 60
February 7, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 7, 2017: House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 7, 2017: House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee
- Yeas: 9