+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration amended.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass amended.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- House Health Committee: do pass.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
February 28, 2017: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 23, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 60
February 8, 2017: House Health Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 8, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8