+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 3:58PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Ways and Means Committee: do pass.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Ways and Means Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (12)
May 5, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
May 5, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
February 23, 2016: Education: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
February 23, 2016: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
February 23, 2016: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 23, 2016: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 5
February 18, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 57
February 18, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
January 25, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
January 25, 2016: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
January 25, 2016: House Ways and Means Committee
- Yeas: 6
January 25, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor