+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- Final disposition: Failed in House on third reading
- Third read: Failed
On March 29, 2007 in the House:
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to TRANS - Gallardo
- Amendment passed: TRANS
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Transportation: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- House first read
+ − Amendments (4)
Transportation - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Transportation - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Transportation - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Transportation - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 4, 2007: Third read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 5
January 22, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
January 22, 2007: Transportation: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor