+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Borrelli
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Mesnard
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs: Do pass
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Borrelli Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Mesnard Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Borrelli Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Mesnard Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 10, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
January 28, 2014: Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
January 28, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor