+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On June 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Motion to reconsider
- Motion to reconsider
- Motion to reconsider
On June 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider
- Third read: Failed
On May 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Leff flr amend #2 (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Johnson flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Leff flr amend #1 (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Garcia flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Burns flr amend (ref Leff flr amend #2)
- Motion to amend 1
- Motion to amend 1
- Committee of the Whole:
On May 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On April 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar
On March 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Education K-12: Do pass
On March 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education K-12
- Senate second read
On March 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 11, 2008 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Amendment: Floor Amend to Bill - CL Campbell - w/d
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Consent calendar
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Education (K-12): Do pass
On January 30, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On January 29, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education (K-12)
- House first read
+ − Amendments (5)
Leff Floor Amendment #2; reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Johnson Floor Amendment; reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Leff Floor Amendment #1; reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-24k-12
Senate Fact Sheet
Burns Floor Amendment; reference to Leff Floor Amendment #2
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
June 4, 2008: Third read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 3
March 12, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
February 28, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 3
February 6, 2008: Education (K-12): Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor