+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 11, 2010 in the House:
- Action: Vetoed
On April 29, 2010 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Transmit to House
On April 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 4:36 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 31, 2010 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass
On March 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt: Withdrawn
- Senate second read
On March 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 24, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 18, 2010 in the House:
- Amendment passed: TI
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 25, 2010 in the House:
- Transportation and Infrastructure: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On January 21, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Transportation and Infrastructure
- House first read
+ − Amendments (5)
Transportation and Infrastructure - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Transportation and Infrastructure - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Transportation and Infrastructure - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Transportation and Infrastructure - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
5-14 pshs_asvetoed
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 29, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 3
March 29, 2010: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
March 24, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Present/NV: 6
January 21, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
January 21, 2010: Transportation and Infrastructure: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor