+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 6, 2016 in the House:
- House concurred.
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 6, 2016 in the House:
- Final reading in House: Passed
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
- House Minority Caucus.
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- CWD (ref Bill) adopted
- Yee flr amend (ref CWD) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee: do pass amended.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Norgaard - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 3:58PM.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass.
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (7)
Commerce and Workforce Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Yee flr amend (ref CWD) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Workforce Development
Senate Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Norgaard - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (12)
May 6, 2016: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 53
- Present/NV: 7
May 6, 2016: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 53
April 5, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
April 5, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
March 3, 2016: Commerce and Workforce Development: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
March 3, 2016: Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 18, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 57
February 18, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
February 1, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
February 1, 2016: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
February 1, 2016: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 1, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6