+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 28, 2008 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 112
- Action: Signed
On April 22, 2008 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 21, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: CED (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass amended
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Economic Development
- Senate second read
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 10:30 am
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On February 4, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On January 31, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- House first read
+ − Amendments (6)
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
3-10 ced
Senate Fact Sheet
3-28 caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 22, 2008: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 4
April 21, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
March 6, 2008: Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
March 4, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 60
January 31, 2008: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
January 31, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor