+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 24, 2007 in the House:
- Final disposition: None
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 129
- Action: Signed
On April 18, 2007 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On April 16, 2007 in the House:
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 12, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: JUD (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Senate second read
On February 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 12, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 10:30 am
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 25, 2007 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- House first read
+ − Amendments (8)
Judiciary - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-22 jud strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
3-27 striker memo caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
3-7 strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
3-8 jud
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 18, 2007: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
April 12, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 3
February 20, 2007: Judiciary: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 12, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
January 22, 2007: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
January 22, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor