+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On June 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Retirement and Rural Development: Do pass amended
On June 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Economic Development: Withdrawn
- Judiciary: Withdrawn
- Assigned to committee: Retirement and Rural Development
On June 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
On June 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Economic Development
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On May 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On May 7, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: RULES
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to RULES - Kavanagh
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form
On March 5, 2009 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (11)
Retirement and Rural Development
Senate Adopted Amendment
Kavanagh Substitute Floor amendment to the Rules Committee amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Rules
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Retirement and Rural Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
House Adopted Amendment
Retirement and Rural Development
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Retirement and Rural Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
June 23, 2009: Retirement and Rural Development: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
May 13, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 9
February 12, 2009: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
February 12, 2009: Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1