+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass amended.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Andrade - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:05PM.
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- House Transportation Committee: do pass.
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Transportation Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 2, 2021: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 24, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 15
January 27, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 27, 2021: House Transportation Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor