+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass.
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 22, 2023 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 21, 2023 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:00PM.
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 6, 2023 in the House:
- House Health & Human Services Committee: do pass.
On January 24, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 23, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health & Human Services Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (6)
March 6, 2023: Senate Appropriations1 Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
March 6, 2023: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
March 6, 2023: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 22, 2023: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
January 23, 2023: House Health & Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 23, 2023: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor