+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 11, 2007 in the House:
- Final disposition: None
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 45
- Action: Signed
On April 5, 2007 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 11:55 am
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 10:30 amobject
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 25, 2007 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- House first read
+ − Amendment
3-7jud
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 4, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
February 21, 2007: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 3
February 19, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 5
January 22, 2007: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
January 22, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1