+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- HB 2468 substituted for SB 1143. Motion carried.: Passed
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 4:10PM.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (8)
February 8, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
February 8, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
February 4, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 57
February 4, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
January 21, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 21, 2016: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 14
January 21, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 21, 2016: Appropriations: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 14
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor