+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On July 2, 2007 in the House:
- Final disposition: None
- Action: Signed
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 275
On June 19, 2007 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Transmit to House
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On June 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Government: Withdrawn
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Bill)
On May 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
On April 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On April 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 5, 2007 in the House:
- Representative pearce moved that the House reconsider hb 2467 on thursday, april 5, 2007. motion passed by s/v 29-25.
- Motion
- Vote detail 31 22 7 0 passed
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Failed
On March 29, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Lujan
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Sinema
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Homeland Security and Property Rights: Do pass
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Homeland Security and Property Rights
- House first read
+ − Amendments (6)
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
7-10 as enacted
Senate Fact Sheet
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
6-18approp_strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (7)
June 19, 2007: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 1
June 18, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
June 18, 2007: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
April 5, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 7
April 4, 2007: Third read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 5
January 23, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
January 23, 2007: Homeland Security and Property Rights: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1