+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 7, 2016 in the House:
- Final reading in House: Passed
- House concurred.
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- RULES (ref FI) adopted
- FI (ref Bill) adopted
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration amended.
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Financial Institutions Committee: do pass amended.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Financial Institutions Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- BFS - passed
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Banking and Financial Services Committee: do pass amended.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Banking and Financial Services Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (9)
Financial Institutions
Senate Proposed Amendment
Financial Institutions
Senate Proposed Amendment
Banking and Financial Services
House Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Financial Institutions
Senate Adopted Amendment
Banking and Financial Services
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (12)
May 7, 2016: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 6
May 7, 2016: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 4
April 5, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
April 5, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 2
March 3, 2016: Senate Financial Institutions Committee
- Yeas: 6
March 3, 2016: Financial Institutions: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 1, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 4
March 1, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
January 25, 2016: Banking and Financial Services: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
January 25, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 25, 2016: House Banking and Financial Services Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
January 25, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor