+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 28, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Final disposition: Held awaiting third reading
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (2)
February 10, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
February 10, 2009: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor