+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Vote detail 29 29 2 0 y failed
- Motion to reconsider: Date ayes nays nv exc vac
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- 0 0 0 0
- Motion
- Representative mesnard moved that the House reconsider hb2465 on tuesday, march 11th, 2014. motion passed by v/v.
- Final disposition: Failed in House on third reading on reconsideration
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Failed
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Mesnard
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Mesnard Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Mesnard Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 5, 2014: Third read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 31
- Present/NV: 2
January 29, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 29, 2014: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor