+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources Committee: do pass.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- RULES - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: amended constitutional and in proper form.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee: do pass.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
Rules
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
February 18, 2016: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
February 18, 2016: Natural Resources: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 18, 2016: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 18, 2016: Senate Natural Resources Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 16, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 60
February 16, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 60
January 25, 2016: Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 25, 2016: Energy, Environment and Natural Resources: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 25, 2016: House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 25, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7