+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 11, 2010 in the House:
- Action: Vetoed
On April 30, 2010 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 29, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On April 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: GOV (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Tibshraeny flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Aguirre flr amend (ref Bill)
On April 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On April 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Government Institutions: Do pass amended
On March 31, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 30, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government Institutions
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 29, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 18, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Ableser
On March 16, 2010 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 28, 2010 in the House:
- Transportation and Infrastructure: Do pass
On January 20, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation and Infrastructure
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (9)
Tibshraeny flr amend (ref Bill)
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government Institutions
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government Institutions
Senate Adopted Amendment
Ableser Floor amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Government Institutions
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government Institutions
Senate Adopted Amendment
Tibshraeny flr amend (ref Bill)
Senate Adopted Amendment
4-12 gov_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Ableser Floor amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 29, 2010: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 3
April 29, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 3
March 30, 2010: Government Institutions: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 3
March 29, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
January 19, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
January 19, 2010: Transportation and Infrastructure: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor