+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- Final disposition: Failed in House on third reading
- Third read: Failed
On March 29, 2007 in the House:
- Amendment: Floor Amend to Bill - Campbell CH - failed s/v 22-26
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Homeland Security and Property Rights: Do pass
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Homeland Security and Property Rights
- House first read
+ − Votes (3)
April 4, 2007: Third read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 5
January 23, 2007: Homeland Security and Property Rights: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 2
January 23, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4