+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Pearce
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 11:00 amobject
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 12, 2007 in the House:
- Homeland Security and Property Rights: Do pass
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Homeland Security and Property Rights
- House first read
+ − Amendments (2)
Pearce Floor Amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Pearce Floor Amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 28, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 60
January 23, 2007: Homeland Security and Property Rights: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
January 23, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor