+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Children and Family Affairs Committee: do pass.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Children and Family Affairs Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (4)
January 26, 2016: Children and Family Affairs: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
January 26, 2016: House Children and Family Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 26, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 26, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2