+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred.
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Final reading in House: Passed
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- ED (ref Bill) adopted
- APPROP (ref Bill) adopted
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass amended.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- RULES - withdrawn
- SUB Floor Amend to LARA to Bill - Nutt - passed
- LARA
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Rules Committee: amended constitutional and in proper form.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee: do pass amended.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (7)
May 8, 2017: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 10
April 27, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 27
February 28, 2017: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 28, 2017: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 23, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 20
February 8, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 8, 2017: House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor