+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 10, 2012 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 225
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 5, 2012 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 4, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 3:10 pmobject
On March 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: ENR
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Energy and Natural Resources: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Energy and Natural Resources
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
Energy and Natural Resources - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Energy and Natural Resources - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
3-12 jud
Senate Fact Sheet
Energy and Natural Resources - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Energy and Natural Resources - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 4, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 2
March 6, 2012: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
March 5, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
January 18, 2012: Energy and Natural Resources: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
January 18, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1