+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 16, 2007 in the House:
- Final disposition: None
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 79
- Action: Signed
On April 10, 2007 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On April 5, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 3, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: PSHS (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass amended
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Senate second read
On February 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 12, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: NRPS
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to NRPS - Pearce
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Natural Resources and Public Safety: Do pass amended
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Public Safety
- House first read
+ − Amendments (10)
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Adopted Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources and Public Safety
House Adopted Amendment
Pearce Substitute Floor Amendment to the Natural Resources and Public Safety Committee Amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources and Public Safety
House Adopted Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-30 caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Pearce Substitute Floor Amendment to the Natural Resources and Public Safety Committee Amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
2-27 PSHS
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 10, 2007: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
April 3, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
February 20, 2007: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 12, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
January 23, 2007: Natural Resources and Public Safety: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 10
January 23, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2