+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On June 20, 2013 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 234
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote detail 19 9 2 0 passed
- Motion to reconsider: Date ayes nays nv exc vac
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- 0 0 0 0
- Motion
- Senator mccomish motion to reconsider whereby the Senate failed to pass hb 2457 on third reading on may 1, 2013. motion carried.
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Failed
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:25 pm
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce, Energy and Military
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: COM
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (6)
May 14, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
May 1, 2013: Third read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 3
March 5, 2013: Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 28, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 4
January 23, 2013: Commerce: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
January 23, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor