+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- House Elections Committee: do pass.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 4:10PM.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Elections Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (6)
February 4, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 16
February 4, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 4
January 25, 2016: Elections: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
January 25, 2016: House Elections Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
January 25, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 25, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (45)
Type:
Primary Sponsor