+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources Committee: do pass.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- AWL - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- House Agriculture, Water and Lands Committee: do pass amended.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Agriculture, Water and Lands Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
Agriculture, Water and Lands
House Proposed Amendment
Agriculture, Water and Lands
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
March 9, 2016: Natural Resources: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
March 9, 2016: Senate Natural Resources Committee
- Yeas: 5
February 18, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
February 18, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 57
January 26, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
January 26, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
January 26, 2016: House Agriculture, Water and Lands Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 26, 2016: Agriculture, Water and Lands: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor