+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee: do pass.
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee: do pass.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (6)
April 22, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
March 7, 2019: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 7
March 7, 2019: Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee
- Yeas: 7
March 6, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 5
January 30, 2019: House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee
- Yeas: 12
January 30, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor